+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 9, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0311)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 311 (effective 7/1/10)
On March 11, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1174ER)
- Enrolled
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 16, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 10101234D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1174E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 14, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: #1 Housing
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10101234D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
March 1, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2010: Reported from General Laws and Technology (13-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2010: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor