+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 2, 2002 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0294)
On April 1, 2002 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 294 (effective 7/1/02)
On March 19, 2002 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 18, 2002 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 13, 2002 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1174ER)
On March 1, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 28, 2002 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2002 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2002 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 6, 2002 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 4, 2002 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2002 in the House:
- Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
On January 18, 2002 in the House:
- Assigned to C. C. T. sub-committee: 1
On January 11, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 020234770
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2002: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2002: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2002: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N)
February 6, 2002: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 1, 2002: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor