+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (53)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0539)
On April 15, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 539 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1174ER)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 985488323-H2
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by conference committee
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reading of conference report waived
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 985488323
On March 13, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute rejected by House (6-Y 93-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 93-N)
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate insisted on substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senators: Hawkins, Howell, Marye
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- House acceded to request
- Conferees appointed by House
- Delegates: Landes, Johnson, Crittenden
On March 12, 1998 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 985459323-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - comm. sub. 985459323-S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 985459323-S1
- Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989660323-H1
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Committee substitute agreed to 989660323-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989660323-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 980756323
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT R (40-Y 0-N)
March 13, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (97-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST R (40-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 93-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: Reported from Finance with substitute (17-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with sub. (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor