+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On January 30, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 27, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 14103702D
+ − Votes (4)
February 19, 2014: Stricken at the request of Patron in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
January 24, 2014: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (21-Y 0-N)
January 23, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor