+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (45)
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0702)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 702 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 17, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1173ER)
- Enrolled
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 12106123D-H2
- VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N)
- Conference report agreed to by House (61-Y 36-N)
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Delegates: Lingamfelter, Stolle, Dance
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senators: Obenshain, Blevins, Newman
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N)
- Senate substitute rejected by House 12105622D-S1 (1-Y 93-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by temporarily
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105622D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N 1-A)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1173S1
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 12105622D-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 37-N)
- Read third time and passed House (61-Y 37-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1173H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105039D-H1
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105039D-H1
- Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
On January 20, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Teachers and Admin. Action
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 12102624D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (10)
March 10, 2012: Conference report agreed to by Senate (32-Y 7-N 1-A)
March 10, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (61-Y 36-N)
March 2, 2012: Senate insisted on substitute (37-Y 1-N 1-A)
February 29, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 93-N)
February 27, 2012: Passed Senate with substitute (20-Y 19-N 1-A)
February 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2012: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (8-Y 7-N)
February 10, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (61-Y 37-N)
February 6, 2012: Reported from Education with substitute (14-Y 8-N)
February 2, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor