+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (39-Y 0-N)
- Stricken from Senate calendar (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute agreed to 988787323-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 988787323-S1
On March 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-com: Criminal Law and Procedure
On February 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 988744323-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 988744323-H1
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 988744323-H1
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of passage agreed to by House
- Passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 2, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 988867323
+ − Votes (6)
March 10, 1998: VOTE: STRIKE FROM CALENDAR R (39-Y 0-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 8, 1998: Reported from Courts of Justice w/sub. (14-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from C. J. with substitute (24-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor