+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On April 26, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0681)
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 681 (effective-see bill)
On March 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 24, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 23, 2000 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 21, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1172ER)
On March 13, 2000 in the House:
- Conference substitute printed 008481652-H1
On March 10, 2000 in the House:
- Conference report agreed to by House (92-Y 6-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by conference committee
- Sub. recommended by conference comm. 008481652-H1
On March 10, 2000 in the Senate:
- Passed by temporarily
- Reading of conference report waived
- Conference report agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senators: Quayle, Barry, Howell
- Conferees appointed by Senate
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Delegates: Bryant, Broman, Clement
- Conferees appointed by House
On March 3, 2000 in the House:
- House acceded to request
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Senate requested conference committee
- VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 1-N)
- Senate insisted on amendment (37-Y 1-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 92-N)
- Senate amendment rejected by House (6-Y 92-N)
On February 28, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 25, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
- Read third time and passed House (91-Y 7-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (22-Y 2-N)
On February 1, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Tra. sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented & ordered printed 003467652
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Votes (9)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: CONF. COMMITTEE RPT (39-Y 0-N)
March 10, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (92-Y 6-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: INSIST & REQUEST (37-Y 1-N)
February 29, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (6-Y 92-N)
February 25, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 24, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
February 23, 2000: Reported from Finance with amendment (16-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (91-Y 7-N)
February 12, 2000: Reported from Tra. (22-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor