+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 11, 2002 in the House:
- Passed by indefinitely in App. (15-Y 10-N)
On February 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Finance with sub (12-Y 10-N)
On February 5, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Referred from Appropriations (25-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Education with substitute (13-Y 9-N)
On January 9, 2002 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented & ordered printed 023260732