+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Transportation
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in Transportation by voice vote
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Presented and ordered printed 14103609D
+ − Sponsors (5)
A. Benton Chafin-Senate Elect
Type:
Primary Sponsor