+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 24, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0639)
On April 8, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 639 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1163ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 10-N)
- Passed Senate (29-Y 10-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 16-N)
- Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
On February 11, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (23-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 6
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Presented & ordered printed 005458200
+ − Votes (7)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (22-Y 16-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (29-Y 10-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: RECONSIDER (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: Reported from General Laws (14-Y 1-N)
February 10, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2000: Reported from General Laws (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor