+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0856)
- Enacted, Chapter 856 (effective 7/1/10)
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1161ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 21, 2010 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
On April 21, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (94-Y 0-N)
On April 20, 2010 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 13, 2010 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 12, 2010 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 10, 2010 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1161ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2010 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2010 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 26, 2010 in the Senate:
- Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2010 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Rehabilitation and Social Services
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 12, 2010 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (96-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2010 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2010 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2010 in the House:
- Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2010 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
On January 21, 2010 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: #3
On January 13, 2010 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103898D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (8)
April 21, 2010: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
April 21, 2010: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (94-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2010: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2010: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 26, 2010: Reported from Rehabilitation and Social Services (15-Y 0-N)
February 12, 2010: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2010: Reported from Militia, Police and Public Safety (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2010: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor