+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 4, 2014 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0597)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 597 (effective 7/1/14)
On February 28, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 26, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1161ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2014 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 14103761D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1161E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Higher Education
On January 15, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Education
- Presented and ordered printed 14103761D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2014: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2014: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2014: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2014: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2014: Reported from Education with amendments (22-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2014: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor