+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (61)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0792)
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1160ER2)
- Reenrolled
- Governor's recommendation adopted
On April 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N)
On April 18, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation (89-Y 7-N)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 792 (effective 7/1/12)
On April 17, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On April 9, 2012 in the House:
- Governor's substitute bill reprinted 12106374D-H2
- Governor's substitute printed 12106374D-H2
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 10, 2012 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1160ER)
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Senate receded from amendment (37-Y 1-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Reconsideration receding from amendment agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Senate receded from amendment (28-Y 10-N)
- Passed by temporarily
On March 6, 2012 in the House:
- Senate amendment rejected by House (48-Y 51-N)
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N)
On March 5, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 2, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 29, 2012 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N)
- Committee amendment rejected
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
- Amendment by Senator Petersen agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Chair votes No
- Motion to recommit to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N)
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
- Read third time and passed House (96-Y 4-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1160H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105055D-H1
- Read second time
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105055D-H1
- Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
On January 23, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned Courts sub: #2 Civil
On January 16, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented and ordered printed 12103119D
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (16)
April 18, 2012: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (36-Y 1-N)
April 18, 2012: VOTE: ADOPTION (89-Y 7-N)
March 8, 2012: Senate receded from amendment (37-Y 1-N)
March 7, 2012: Senate receded from amendment (28-Y 10-N)
March 6, 2012: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 51-N)
February 28, 2012: Committee amendment reconsidered (38-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 1-N)
February 28, 2012: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 1-N)
February 27, 2012: Motion to recommit to committee rejected (20-Y 20-N)
February 24, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (8-Y 4-N 3-A)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 4-N)
February 10, 2012: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (16-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor