+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On May 3, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0875)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 875 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1160ER)
On March 7, 2000 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N)
On March 6, 2000 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Title replaced
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 001518784-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 001518784-H1
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
- Committee substitute printed 001518784-H1
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 002652784
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 7, 2000: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice w/amds (15-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from C. J. with substitute (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor