+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (17)
On March 4, 2004 in the Senate:
- Passed by indefinitely in Ed. & Health (9-Y 6-N)
On January 29, 2004 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 28, 2004 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (69-Y 28-N)
- Read third time and passed House (69-Y 28-N)
On January 27, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 26, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 23, 2004 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 22, 2004 in the House:
- Engrossed by House
- VOTE: REJECTED (12-Y 85-N)
- Amendments by Del. Pollard rejected (12-Y 85-N)
- Read second time
On January 21, 2004 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 20, 2004 in the House:
- Reported from H. W. I. (11-Y 10-N)
On January 14, 2004 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented & ordered printed, prefiled 12/22/03 043429396