+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 2006 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Committee substitute printed 067377380-H2
- Reported from Finance with substitute (18-Y 2-N)
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 062760380-H1
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (18-Y 4-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062828380