+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (24)
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Requires 21 affirmative votes for passage
- Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1151S1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20108919D-S1
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 20108919D-S1
- Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N)
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (50-Y 46-N)
- VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1151H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107423D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
- Incorporates HB1673 (Ware)
- Committee substitute printed 20107423D-H1
On January 31, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101671D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 26, 2020: Defeated by Senate (20-Y 20-N)
February 26, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (14-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 46-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Finance with substitute (12-Y 10-N)
January 31, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (6-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Alfonso H. Lopez
Type:
Primary Sponsor