+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (31)
On April 3, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
On March 24, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 11, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1150ER)
On March 3, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (100-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Senator Whipple agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1150H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 065196380-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 065196380-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 065264380
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2006: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor