+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (36)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP1226)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reconsideration of Governor's recommendation agreed to (38-Y 1-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Governor's recommendation BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (95-Y 0-N)
- Enacted, Chapter 1226 (effective - see bill)
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
- Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1149ER2)
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On March 10, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 3, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 10, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 3, 2020
On February 26, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2020 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1149ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 27, 2020 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1149H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20106259D-H1
- Read second time
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20106259D-H1
- Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Labor and Commerce
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105073D
+ − Impact Statements (3)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (9)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
April 22, 2020: VOTE: (95-Y 0-N)
April 22, 2020: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2020: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 19, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2020: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 0-N)
January 27, 2020: VOTE: (99-Y 0-N)
January 21, 2020: Reported from Labor and Commerce with substitute (20-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark L. Keam
Type:
Primary Sponsor