+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 9, 1996 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0579)
On April 4, 1996 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 579 (effective 7/1/96)
On March 18, 1996 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 1996 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 15, 1996 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 10, 1996 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1149ER)
On February 26, 1996 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 4-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (96-Y 4-N)
On February 23, 1996 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 22, 1996 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
On February 21, 1996 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 1996 in the Senate:
- Reported from Local Government w/amd. (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 1996 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Local Government
- Read first time
On February 13, 1996 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (90-Y 7-N)
- Passed House (90-Y 7-N)
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 961406196-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 961406196-H1
On February 12, 1996 in the House:
- Constitutional readings dispensed
- Passed by for the day
- Committee substitute printed 961406196-H1
On February 10, 1996 in the House:
- Read first time
- Reported from C. C. T. with sub. (18-Y 4-N)
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
- Presented & ordered printed 961554196