+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0157)
On March 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 157 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1149ER)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: RECONSIDER R (40-Y 0-N)
- Rec. of Sen. passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Commerce and Labor (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 1998 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N)
On February 14, 1998 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 985514805-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from L. & C. with amendment (19-Y 1-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor
- Presented & ordered printed 985514805