+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (12)
On March 5, 2000 in the Senate:
- Continued to 2001 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (99-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
- Read first time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 001762620
+ − Votes (3)
March 5, 2000: Continued to 2001 in Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2000: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor