+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (50)
On May 15, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0874)
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- Reenrolled bill text (HB1147ER)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Enacted, Chapter 874 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation adopted
- Reenrolled
- Signed by Speaker as reenrolled
On April 22, 1998 in the Senate:
- Senate concurred in Gov's recommendation (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On April 22, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- House concurred in Gov's recom. (Block Vote) (100-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On April 8, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On April 6, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Signed by Speaker
On March 30, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1147ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (98-Y 2-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 9, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Sen. Forbes withdrawn 986871657-S1
- Floor substitute printed 986871657-S1 (Forbes)
- Substitute by Sen. Forbes agreed to 986873657-S2
- Floor substitute printed 986873657-S2 (Forbes)
- Engrossed by Senate - fl. sub. 986873657-S2
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed by for the day
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
On March 3, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Printed as engrossed 989252410-E
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 1998 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989252410
- Referred to Committee on Finance
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (8)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
April 22, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE-ADOPTION (100-Y 0-N)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 2-N)
March 9, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: VOTE: (39-Y 0-N)
March 3, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Finance with amds. (24-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor