+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (40)
On March 31, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0556)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 556 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 17, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 17, 2020
On March 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1147ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (97-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
On February 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Assigned Education sub: Health Professions
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1147E
- Printed as engrossed 20103677D-E
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 4, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned HWI sub: Health Professions
On January 22, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Referred from Courts of Justice by voice vote
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103677D
+ − Impact Statements (6)
+ − Amendments (4)
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2020: VOTE: Adoption (97-Y 0-N)
March 4, 2020: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Reported from Education and Health with amendments (15-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2020: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (100-Y 0-N)
February 4, 2020: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (5-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Mark L. Keam
Type:
Primary Sponsor