+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (38)
On April 14, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0685)
On April 5, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 685 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 16, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 15, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1146ER)
On March 8, 2006 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N)
- Senate substitute agreed to by House (87-Y 8-N)
On March 7, 2006 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 2006 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Committee substitute agreed to 062074448-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB1146S1
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2006 in the Senate:
- Committee substitute printed 062074448-S1
- Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Rereferred to Education and Health
- Rereferred from General Laws and Technology by voice vote
On February 13, 2006 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 10, 2006 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 9, 2006 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1146H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 060502448-H1
- Read second time
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 060502448-H1
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 062347448
+ − Votes (8)
March 8, 2006: VOTE: ADOPTION (87-Y 8-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 6, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
March 3, 2006: VOTE: (38-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor