+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On March 17, 2014 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 244 (effective 7/1/14)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0244)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 25, 2014 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1146ER)
- Enrolled
On February 21, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 0-N)
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2014 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 19, 2014 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendment waived
- Read third time
- Amendment by Senator Puller agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (40-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (15-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2014 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On January 31, 2014 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 30, 2014 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2014 in the House:
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources (21-Y 0-N)
On January 22, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On January 20, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned ACNRsub: Natural Resources
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Presented and ordered printed 14101352D