+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (27)
On April 11, 1994 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0485)
On April 8, 1994 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 485 (effective 7/1/94)
On March 14, 1994 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 12, 1994 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 8, 1994 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1145ER)
On February 25, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 24, 1994 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1994 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1994 in the Senate:
- Read first time
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 1994 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed LD8797252 (HB1145E)
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Amendment by Del. Grayson agreed to
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 1994 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 12, 1994 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amd. (21-Y 0-N)
On January 27, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: 4
On January 26, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Presented and ordered printed
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 25, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1994: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (40-Y 0-N)
February 23, 1994: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 0-N)
February 15, 1994: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 12, 1994: Reported from General Laws with amd. (21-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor