+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On February 24, 2016 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0018)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 18 (effective 7/1/16)
On February 17, 2016 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Wednesday, February 24, 2016
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 2/17/16
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 16, 2016 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1145ER)
- Enrolled
On February 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
On February 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 3, 2016 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2016 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2016 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 29, 2016 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 2016 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 19, 2016 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On January 13, 2016 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 16103268D
+ − Votes (6)
February 12, 2016: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
February 11, 2016: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 0-N)
February 3, 2016: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
January 29, 2016: Reported from Privileges and Elections (21-Y 0-N)
January 28, 2016: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor