+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (42)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, May 18, 2018
- Communicated to Governor
- Speaker ruled Governor's recommendation with a substitute not germane
On April 9, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's substitute printed 18108397D-H1
- Governor's recommendation received by House
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 7, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1144ER)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (52-Y 47-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (52-Y 47-N)
- Reconsideration of Senate amendments agreed to by House
- VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 48-N)
- Senate amendments rejected by House (48-Y 48-N)
- Placed on Calendar
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
- Amendments by Senator Vogel agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: (54-Y 43-N)
- Read third time and passed House (54-Y 43-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18101822D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1144E
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Read second time
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
On January 22, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101822D
+ − Votes (8)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: REJECTED (48-Y 48-N)
March 5, 2018: VOTE: ADOPTION #2 (52-Y 47-N)
March 1, 2018: Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 20, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections (11-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2018: VOTE: (54-Y 43-N)
February 2, 2018: Reported from Privileges and Elections with amendments (16-Y 6-N)
January 24, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (4-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor