+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0540)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 540 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1140ER)
- Enrolled
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 14, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (100-Y 0-N)
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 12, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Public Safety
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed 12103655D
+ − Votes (7)
March 5, 2012: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2012: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 14, 2012: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (100-Y 0-N)
February 10, 2012: Reported from Appropriations (21-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2012: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor