+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 2, 2018 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0112)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 112 (effective 7/1/18)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB114ER)
- Enrolled
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Transportation (12-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 18100927D-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB114E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 24, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment (8-Y 0-N)
On January 16, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #3
On December 15, 2017 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100927D