+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 489 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0489)
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 15, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1138ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 2, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
- Rereferred to Finance
On February 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
On February 12, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 10, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Higher Education
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104143D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (9)
March 2, 2018: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2018: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 22, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2018: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
February 9, 2018: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Education (18-Y 4-N)
February 6, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor