+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (9)
On February 15, 1994 in the House:
- Continued to 1995 in Appropriations (9-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
- Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On February 1, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Reported from H. W. I. (22-Y 0-N)
On January 28, 1994 in the House:
- Assigned to H. W. I. sub-committee: 4
On January 25, 1994 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions
- Presented and ordered printed