+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On March 27, 2020 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0491)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 491 (effective 7/1/20)
On March 12, 2020 in the House:
- Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
On March 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 6, 2020 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 5, 2020 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1136ER)
- Enrolled
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N)
On February 11, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (73-Y 25-N)
- Read third time and passed House (73-Y 25-N)
On February 7, 2020 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1136H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 20107120D-H1
- Read second time
On February 6, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 5, 2020 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 20107120D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned ACNR sub: Natural Resources
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101647D
+ − Impact Statements (2)
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (6)
February 28, 2020: Passed Senate (37-Y 0-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (11-Y 2-N)
February 10, 2020: VOTE: Passage (73-Y 25-N)
February 5, 2020: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (18-Y 3-N)
January 29, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Alfonso H. Lopez
Type:
Primary Sponsor