+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 14, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0427)
On April 4, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 427 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 17, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 14, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1134ER)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 29, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 18, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (96-Y 0-N)
On February 17, 2000 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 002848816-H1
- Committee substitute agreed to 002848816-H1
- Read second time
On February 16, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 15, 2000 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 002848816-H1
- Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to Finance sub-committee: 2
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Finance
- Presented & ordered printed 005625816
+ − Votes (5)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 1, 2000: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 29, 2000: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 18, 2000: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (96-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2000: Reported from Finance with sub (23-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor