+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (30)
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0538)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 538 (effective 4/4/12)
On March 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 1, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1133ER)
- Enrolled
On February 24, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
- Read third time
On February 23, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 15, 2012 in the Senate:
- Assigned to P&E sub: Campaigns and Elections
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N)
- Read third time and passed House (80-Y 18-N)
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 2, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On February 1, 2012 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On January 31, 2012 in the House:
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB1133H1
- Emergency clause added
- Committee substitute agreed to 12104832D-H1
- Read second time
On January 30, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 27, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12104832D-H1
- Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 12, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 12103364D
+ − Votes (6)
February 24, 2012: Passed Senate (37-Y 1-N)
February 23, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 21, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (14-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 7, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE EMERGENCY (80-Y 18-N)
January 27, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections with substitute (15-Y 7-N)
January 24, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (3-Y 2-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor