+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0204)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 204 (effective 7/1/98)
On March 14, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 13, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 6, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1128ER)
On March 2, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendment agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
On February 27, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 26, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendment waived
- Amendment by Sen. Y. B. Miller agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendment (39-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On February 24, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 13, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (99-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 12, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 11, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 10, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 982880825
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
February 26, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
February 25, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
February 24, 1998: Reported from Finance (16-Y 0-N)
February 13, 1998: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N)
February 10, 1998: Reported from Appropriations (30-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor