+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 17, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0478)
On April 5, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 478 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 15, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1128ER)
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (39-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (38-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
On February 14, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- Passed House (Block Vote) (98-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (Block Vote) (97-Y 0-N)
- Printed as engrossed 002121836-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 13, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. J. with amendment (23-Y 0-N)
- Read first time
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 002121836