+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (33)
On March 23, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 455 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0455)
On March 14, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 14, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018
On March 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1124ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On March 1, 2018 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
- Senate substitute agreed to by House 18107737D-S1 (91-Y 8-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (91-Y 8-N)
On February 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 18107737D-S1 (Ruff)
- Reading of substitute waived
- Substitute by Senator Ruff agreed to 18107737D-S1
- Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB1124S1
- Passed Senate with substitute (35-Y 5-N)
On February 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 21, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (8-Y 7-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (87-Y 9-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (87-Y 9-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (21-Y 1-N)
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 2-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101572D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws