+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 9, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
On February 8, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #2
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102973D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (3)
February 9, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N)
February 7, 2018: Reported from Education with amendments (21-Y 1-N)
February 2, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (10-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor