+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (10)
On February 13, 2018 in the House:
- Left in Appropriations
On February 7, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 29, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
- Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned Education sub: Subcommittee #3
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103256D
- Referred to Committee on Education
+ − Votes (3)
February 7, 2018: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (8-Y 0-N)
January 31, 2018: Reported from Education (20-Y 1-N)
January 29, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor