+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On December 4, 2014 in the House:
- Left in Militia, Police and Public Safety
On February 7, 2014 in the House:
- Continued to 2015 in Militia, Police and Public Safety by voice vote
On February 6, 2014 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2015 by voice vote
On January 14, 2014 in the House:
- Assigned MPPS sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 13, 2014 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Militia, Police and Public Safety
- Presented and ordered printed 14103155D