+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0664)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 664 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 8, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1118ER)
- Enrolled
On March 2, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
- Read third time
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
On February 28, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
On February 9, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
On February 7, 2012 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 6, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 3, 2012 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
On January 24, 2012 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 17, 2012 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Elections Subcommittee
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Presented and ordered printed 12100835D
+ − Votes (6)
March 2, 2012: Passed Senate (22-Y 16-N)
March 1, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N)
February 28, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
February 8, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (89-Y 8-N 1-A)
February 3, 2012: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
January 24, 2012: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor