+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 6, 2006 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0454)
On March 31, 2006 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 454 (effective 7/1/06)
On March 1, 2006 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 28, 2006 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On February 27, 2006 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1118ER)
On February 20, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
- Read third time
On February 17, 2006 in the Senate:
- VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2006 in the Senate:
- Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
On February 9, 2006 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology
On February 8, 2006 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N)
On February 7, 2006 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 069316220-E
- Engrossed by House as amended HB1118E
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 6, 2006 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 2, 2006 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
On January 23, 2006 in the House:
- Assigned to General Laws sub-committee: #4 Prof./Occup./Admin. (Cosgrove)
On January 11, 2006 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/06 069316220
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
February 20, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 17, 2006: VOTE: (40-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2006: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N)
February 8, 2006: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N)
February 2, 2006: Reported from General Laws with amendment (22-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor