+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (35)
On May 7, 1998 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0761)
On April 16, 1998 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 761 (effective 7/1/98)
On April 2, 1998 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
On March 31, 1998 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 31, 1998 in the House:
- Enrolled
On March 26, 1998 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1117ER)
On March 12, 1998 in the House:
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (94-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
On March 11, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 10, 1998 in the House:
- Passed by for the day
On March 9, 1998 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On March 6, 1998 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Reading of amendments waived
- Committee amendments agreed to
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 5, 1998 in the Senate:
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (40-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
On February 23, 1998 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Finance
On February 20, 1998 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House (93-Y 3-N)
- VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
- Communicated to Senate
On February 19, 1998 in the House:
- Read second time
- Committee substitute agreed to 989756440-H1
- Engrossed by House - com. sub. 989756440-H1
On February 18, 1998 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 17, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
- Committee substitute printed 989756440-H1
On February 3, 1998 in the House:
- Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
- Referred to Committee on Appropriations
On January 26, 1998 in the House:
- Presented & ordered printed 989815440
- Referred to Committee on Transportation
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
March 12, 1998: VOTE: ADOPTION (94-Y 3-N)
March 6, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE R (40-Y 0-N)
March 5, 1998: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (40-Y 0-N)
March 4, 1998: Reported from Finance with amendments (17-Y 0-N)
February 20, 1998: VOTE: PASSAGE (93-Y 3-N)
February 17, 1998: Reported from Appropriations with sub. (30-Y 0-N)
February 3, 1998: Reported from Tra. (25-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor