+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (24)
On March 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
- Substitute by Senator Surovell agreed to 20109458D-S1
- Chair rules floor substitute by Senator Surovell is germane
- Reading of substitute waived
- Read third time
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
- Floor substitute printed 20109458D-S1 (Surovell)
On March 2, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
- Read third time
On February 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
On January 31, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On January 30, 2020 in the House:
- VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
- Read third time and passed House (56-Y 44-N)
On January 29, 2020 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 28, 2020 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 24, 2020 in the House:
- Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
On January 23, 2020 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 2020 in the House:
- Assigned P & E sub: Campaign Finance
On January 7, 2020 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102715D
+ − Impact Statement
+ − Votes (6)
March 4, 2020: Defeated by Senate (14-Y 26-N)
February 27, 2020: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
February 25, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (9-Y 6-N)
January 30, 2020: VOTE: Passage (56-Y 44-N)
January 24, 2020: Reported from Privileges and Elections (13-Y 9-N)
January 23, 2020: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 0-N)
+ − Sponsor
Sally L. Hudson
Type:
Primary Sponsor