+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (34)
On March 14, 1997 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0120)
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 120 (effective 7/1/97)
On February 22, 1997 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 22, 1997 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On February 18, 1997 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1115ER)
On February 13, 1997 in the House:
- VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 12-N)
- Senate amendments agreed to by House (86-Y 12-N)
On February 12, 1997 in the House:
- Placed on Calendar
On February 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
- Passed Senate with amendments (40-Y 0-N)
- Engrossed by Senate as amended
- Amendments by Sen. Norment agreed to
- Reading of amendments waived
- Read third time
On February 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- Passed by for the day
On February 6, 1997 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On February 5, 1997 in the Senate:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
On January 14, 1997 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N)
On January 13, 1997 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
- Read third time and passed House (Block Vote) (95-Y 0-N)
On January 10, 1997 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On January 9, 1997 in the House:
- Read first time
On December 23, 1996 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 962269442
On December 20, 1996 in the House:
- Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
On February 11, 1996 in the House:
- Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N)
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- Introduced bill reprinted 962269442
- Assigned to C. J. sub-committee: 1
On January 22, 1996 in the House:
- Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice
- Presented & ordered printed 962269442
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Votes (7)
February 13, 1997: VOTE: ADOPTION (86-Y 12-N)
February 11, 1997: VOTE: PASSAGE (40-Y 0-N)
February 6, 1997: VOTE: CONST. READING DISPENSED (39-Y 0-N)
February 5, 1997: Reported from Courts of Justice (15-Y 0-N)
January 13, 1997: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N)
December 20, 1996: Reported from Courts of Justice (21-Y 0-N)
February 11, 1996: Continued to 1997 in Courts of Justice (19-Y 3-N)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor