+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (23)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 170 (effective 7/1/18)
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0170)
On February 26, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2018
- Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 5, 2018
On February 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- Enrolled
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1114ER)
- Signed by Speaker
On February 19, 2018 in the Senate:
- Read third time
- Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
On February 6, 2018 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 5, 2018 in the House:
- Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N)
- VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- Read second time and engrossed
On February 1, 2018 in the House:
- Read first time
On January 30, 2018 in the House:
- Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
On January 25, 2018 in the House:
- Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
On January 19, 2018 in the House:
- Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1
On January 10, 2018 in the House:
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18104241D
- Referred to Committee on General Laws
+ − Votes (6)
February 19, 2018: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N)
February 16, 2018: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 15, 2018: Reported from Education and Health (15-Y 0-N)
February 5, 2018: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N)
January 30, 2018: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N)
January 25, 2018: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor