+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (24)
On April 6, 2012 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0663)
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 663 (effective 7/1/12)
On March 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 9, 2012 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1113ER)
- Enrolled
On March 6, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
- Read third time
On March 5, 2012 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
On March 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources (10-Y 5-N)
On February 14, 2012 in the Senate:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
- Constitutional reading dispensed
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N)
On February 10, 2012 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 12105228D-EH1
- Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB1113EH1
- Amendments by Delegate Toscano agreed to
- Committee substitute agreed to 12105228D-H1
- Read second time
On February 9, 2012 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2012 in the House:
- Committee substitute printed 12105228D-H1
- Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
On January 11, 2012 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
- Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12104017D
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2012: Passed Senate (33-Y 7-N)
March 5, 2012: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
February 13, 2012: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor