+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On May 3, 2000 in the House:
- Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0873)
On April 9, 2000 in the House:
- Approved by Governor-Chapter 873 (effective 7/1/00)
On March 22, 2000 in the Senate:
- Signed by President
On March 20, 2000 in the House:
- Signed by Speaker
- Enrolled
On March 16, 2000 in the House:
- Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB1111ER)
On March 6, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time
On March 3, 2000 in the Senate:
- VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
- Const. reading disp., passed by for the day (39-Y 0-N)
On March 2, 2000 in the Senate:
- Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
On February 14, 2000 in the Senate:
- Constitutional reading dispensed
- Referred to Committee on Education and Health
On February 11, 2000 in the House:
- Communicated to Senate
- VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
- Read third time and passed House (97-Y 0-N)
On February 10, 2000 in the House:
- Printed as engrossed 006014952-E
- Engrossed by House as amended
- Committee amendment agreed to
- Read second time
On February 9, 2000 in the House:
- Read first time
On February 8, 2000 in the House:
- Reported from C. I. B. w/amd (24-Y 1-N)
On January 28, 2000 in the House:
- Assigned to C. I. B. sub-committee: 3
On January 24, 2000 in the House:
- Referred to Committee on Corporations, Insurance and Banking
- Presented & ordered printed 006014952
+ − Amendment
+ − Votes (5)
March 6, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (38-Y 0-N 1-A)
March 3, 2000: VOTE: CONST. RDG. DISPENSED R (39-Y 0-N)
March 2, 2000: Reported from Education and Health (13-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 11, 2000: VOTE: PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N 1-A)
February 8, 2000: Reported from C. I. B. w/amd (24-Y 1-N)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor